Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from taking certain actions with the intent to interrupt or impair the functioning of a public safety answering point; prohibiting a person from taking certain actions that interrupt or impair the functioning of a public safety answering point; and authorizing penalties for certain violations of imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine not to exceed $25,000 or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0496
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0744 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page