Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law establishing educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities under the State Department of Education; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Board in the Department of Juvenile Services; requiring the Board to oversee and approve all educational services to all juveniles who are in a residential facility beginning July 1, 2022; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Program; requiring the Board to appoint a Juvenile Services Education Program Superintendent; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-501 through 9-506, 9-601 through 9-606 )
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:19 PM