Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "charitable contribution" to exclude an authorization for or a discount on the use of certain services or materials, equipment, or facilities for purposes of provisions of law regulating charitable organizations and charitable representatives; authorizing the Maryland Secretary of State to accept certain documentation in place of an audit or review in connection with a charitable organization's registration statement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0254
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/25/2022
Legislative Date
7/25/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Charitable Contribution - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/26/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/26/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/25/2022 7/25/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Charitable Contribution - Definition
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2023 2/28/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2023 2/26/2023 Favorable with Amendments {373021/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2023 2/26/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
House 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 9:40 AM
Click to return on the top page