Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore City to spend, after recovering costs, the remaining balance of fines collected as a result of violations enforced by certain traffic and vehicle monitoring systems on activities eligible for funding under the State Highway Administration's Safe Routes to School Program or public safety or transportation infrastructure improvements consistent with the purpose and goals of the Complete Streets Program and the Complete Streets Transportation System; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0226 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2021
Legislative Date
10/14/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2021 10/14/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page