Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Lifesaver Schools Program to recognize public schools that provide health and safety training to students and school personnel; requiring Lifesaver Schools to offer students, at a minimum, training on cardiopulmonary resuscitation and first aid, mental health wellness programs or a peer mentoring program, provide service hours for student participants, and offer certain training to school personnel; and authorizing a public school to partner with the county board to meet the criteria to qualify as a Lifesaver School.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0593 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/07/2023
Legislative Date
9/07/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/07/2023 9/07/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2024 10:55 AM
Click to return on the top page