Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, C. Branch, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Palakovich Carr, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from personal property taxes; prohibiting the supervisor of a county or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after December 31, 2024; and requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to report to certain committees of the General Assembly, by October 1 each year, on the number and location of projects that, in the immediately preceding taxable year, have received the exemption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0264
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-37)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983327/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-37) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text - Chapter - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page