Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Community Development Administration in the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer a home buyer assistance program that assists certain teachers with receiving certain low-interest mortgages for the purchase of homes near where the teacher is employed; and requiring the Administration to administer certain community development projects to provide certain teachers with certain financial assistance to buy homes near where the teacher is employed under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page