Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, and Woods
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2025, each hospital and urgent care center in the State to implement an evidence-based protocol for the early recognition and treatment of a patient with sepsis, severe sepsis, or septic shock that is based on generally acceptable standards of care; requiring a specialty psychiatric hospital to establish a certain process; and requiring hospitals and urgent care centers to require periodic training in the implementation of the protocol for certain staff.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/27/2023
Legislative Date
7/27/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/27/2023 7/27/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {653427/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
(   19-310.4 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page