Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that ground leases or amendments that are not posted on the State Department of Assessments and Taxation's website are not considered registered or amended; prohibiting a ground lease holder from collecting or attempting to collect rent, late fees, interest, collection costs, and other expenses related to a ground lease unless the ground lease is registered with the Department; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0193
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2022
Legislative Date
10/05/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2022 10/05/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
House 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
House 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/6/2023 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page