Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Sponsored by
Delegate D.M. Davis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a certain annual report certain statistics related to the cost of living of inmates at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in an annual financial and operational report of the Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain statistics regarding the race, age, and sex of certain inmates, currently employed at certain facilities, disaggregated by job classification and wage scale.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page