Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Sustainable Maryland Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to expand and enhance Sustainable Maryland's promotion and support of communities in Maryland in the effort to realize environmental, economic, and social sustainability; authorizing the Fund to be used for training and education, outreach and engagement, and developing and expanding the Sustainable Maryland program; requiring the Governor, for Fiscal Year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter, to provide an appropriation of $750,000 to the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0014
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2021
Legislative Date
10/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2021 10/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-105 )
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 12:25 PM
Click to return on the top page