Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring as part of a complaint for repossession for failure to pay rent that a landlord provide registration or licensing information for a property for which registration or licensing is required under local law and to state whether a property is an affected property under certain lead-based paint abatement laws; requiring a rental property in Baltimore City to be in compliance with lead-based paint abatement requirements before a landlord may file a complaint for repossession of the property for failure to pay rent; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/26/2021
Legislative Date
7/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/26/2021 7/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-2, 9-5 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page