Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to study the feasibility of including removable full and partial dentures and setting adequate reimbursement rates for providers on a per-patient basis for house calls and extended care facility calls among the coverage offered by the Maryland Healthy Smiles Dental Program; and requiring the Department to report its findings from the study to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by December 1, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0600
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/1/2024 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page