Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that a specified committee adopt an apportionment formula for Program Open Space funds to require the Department of Natural Resources in consultation with a specified committee to adopt the apportionment formula; altering the membership of the committee; repealing the authority of the committee to reallocate Program Open Space funds; repealing a requirement that before adopting an apportionment formula the committee provide notification and opportunity for a hearing; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Rules 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   5-902, 5-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page