Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to require that proposals requesting Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program funding contain certain response standards that minimize law enforcement interaction for individuals in crisis; altering the proposals the Department is required to prioritize in awarding grants under the Program; requiring a local behavioral health authority, for each service or program that receives funding under the Program, to make certain information available to the public; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0286
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2021 5:44 PM
Click to return on the top page