Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Maryland Children's Health Program - Eligibility and Enrollment
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Guzzone, Hill, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Rosenberg, Taveras, White, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish an Express Lane Eligibility Program by January 1, 2025, to enroll individuals, based on eligibility findings by the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program; prohibiting the Department from considering any other income or eligibility requirements; requiring the Department to apply for certain waivers, as needed, in order to maximize the number of State residents who qualify for the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0026
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/26/2022
Legislative Date
9/26/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2023
Legislative Date
1/22/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/26/2022 9/26/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children's Health Program, and Social Services Programs - Eligibility and Enrollment
House 1/22/2023 1/22/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {143829/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Maryland Children's Health Program - Eligibility and Enrollment
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Referred Finance 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 8:14 AM
Click to return on the top page