Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Teacher Apprenticeship Startup Grant Program in the Department of Labor to provide high school and college students, and career changers opportunities to begin a career in education; requiring the establishment of apprenticeships that develop career paths and to pay apprentices certain compensation; authorizing the Department of Labor to award up to $500,000 to develop and launch a teacher apprenticeship program; requiring a sponsor to coordinate with the CTE Committee to develop a high school-level program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0084
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1233 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2023
Legislative Date
10/31/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2023 10/31/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Text - First - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
House 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:47 PM
Click to return on the top page