Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a cooperative housing corporation to require through its governing documents that members maintain an insurance policy on their unit and mandating that governing documents with the requirement also require the member to provide evidence of the insurance on request of the governing body; and requiring the governing documents of a condominium association that require a unit owner to maintain insurance on their unit to require the unit owner to provide evidence of the insurance on the request of the counsel of unit owners.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0065
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2021
Legislative Date
10/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2021 10/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page