Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers – Provision of Real Estate Brokerage Services Through a Team – Use of “and Associates”
Sponsored by
Delegate Miller
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "team" as it relates to real estate brokerage services to mean two or more licensed associate real estate brokers or licensed real estate salespersons or any combination thereof who work together on a regular basis to provide real estate brokerage services, represent themselves to the public as being part of one entity, and designate themselves by a collective name such as team or group or by using the words "and associates".
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463494/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Advertisements - Use of "and Associates"
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {463494/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers – Provision of Real Estate Brokerage Services Through a Team – Use of “and Associates”
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text - Chapter - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers – Provision of Real Estate Brokerage Services Through a Team – Use of “and Associates”
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page