Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the term "sexual orientation" in the context of hate crimes; including gender identity in the list of characteristics protected by the prohibition on hate crimes; authorizing a court to require an offender convicted of hate crimes to complete an antibias education program; requiring the University System of Maryland to manage the development of an antibias education program that provides antibias education relevant to certain provisions of Maryland law by January 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0220
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582916/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Long) Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {703125/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (47-89)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-13)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {373820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {582916/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Long) Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {703125/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (47-89) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (126-13) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {373820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Age
(   12-120 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page