Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to require that proposals requesting Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program funding contain response standards that prioritize mobile crisis units over law enforcement when responding to individuals in crisis; defining "mobile crisis team" to include prioritizing limiting interaction of law enforcement with individuals in crisis; and requiring each public safety answering point to develop a written policy for calls involving an individual suffering an active mental health crisis.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0012
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {743526/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (43-94)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-39)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103321/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Floor Amendment {743526/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (43-94) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-39) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page