Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on LGBTQ Affairs in the Governor's Office of Community Initiatives; providing for the appointment, qualifications, terms, and removal of Commission members; requiring the Commission to elect annually a chair and vice chair; authorizing the Commission to appoint a director; establishing that the director is a special appointment; requiring publication of an annual report to include recommendations on policies for LGBTQ adults and youth to end discriminatory practices in the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0706 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2020
Legislative Date
8/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/19/2020 8/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:57 PM