Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that teachers in the Juvenile Services Education Program who are employed by the Department of Juvenile Services and teachers in an educational and workforce skills program who are employed by the Maryland Department of Labor are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System; requiring the Director of Education and Workforce Skills Training for Correctional Institutions to set certain qualification standards for teachers in workforce skills training programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/26/2021
Legislative Date
8/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-33)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/26/2021 8/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803124/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-33) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page