Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Career and Technical Education Committee; altering the Committee's duties and authorized actions to include the perspective of career colleges and skilled trade organizations; and requiring the Committee to develop and provide to guidance counselors and public schools in the State a list of all skilled trade organization programs and career school programs in the State.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0541 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2023
Legislative Date
1/18/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
House 1/18/2023 1/18/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2023 10:31 AM
Click to return on the top page