Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain health occupations boards to adopt regulations establishing reciprocity for individuals licensed or certified in another state.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0221
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/13/2023
Legislative Date
9/13/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/13/2023 9/13/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573528/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page