Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish and maintain a voluntary registry on the Department's website for property owners who have registered a claim of riparian rights with the Department; requiring the Governor to appropriate funds to the Department to cover the cost of establishing and maintaining the registry; requiring the holder of a covenant for riparian rights to be provided notice of a proposed project in the immediate area at the beginning of the State or local permitting process or other approval process; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0160 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16-201.1 )
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page