Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the entity that must administer or approve an apprenticeship program for electricians; substituting the term "uninsured" for the term "inactive" in certain provisions of law relating to liability insurance requirements for certain electricians; prohibiting a certain electrician from contracting to provide electrical services unless the electrical work is covered by certain liability insurance; specifying who is authorized and required to purchase certain insurance; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0044
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 2/9/2023 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page