Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsored by
Delegates Pippy, Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the time period from 5 to 7 years during which a health care provider is prohibited from destroying medical records and laboratory and X-ray reports; requiring that the notice required to be provided regarding the destruction of medical records be made to the last known e-mail address of the patient or the parent or guardian of a minor; requiring a health care provider to make a medical record available for retrieval by a patient or a parent or guardian of a minor within a certain time period and at a certain location; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/17/2023
Legislative Date
10/17/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Records - Destruction - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Medical Records - Destruction - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/17/2023 10/17/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Records - Destruction - Authorization
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {643023/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Medical Records - Destruction - Authorization
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:14 AM
Click to return on the top page