Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Hill, Martinez, Nawrocki, Pena-Melnyk, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Department of Labor, to conduct a study of the environmental and public health impacts of deathcare and funeral practices in the State; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0869 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/03/2023
Legislative Date
10/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Cullison, White Holland and Hutchinson)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Cullison, White Holland and Hutchinson)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Hester and Simonaire)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Hester and Simonaire)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/03/2023 10/03/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices
House 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {293620/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Cullison, White Holland and Hutchinson) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Cullison, White Holland and Hutchinson) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Hester and Simonaire) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Hester and Simonaire) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page