Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date on which the registration of a pharmacy benefits manager expires unless the registration is renewed.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Rules 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
(   15-1605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page