Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Registry - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Barve, Chang, Feldmark, Ivey, Lehman, Palakovich Carr, Ruth, Shetty, Stewart, Wilkins, Young, Bartlett, Cardin, Conaway, Kaufman, Pasteur, Simpson, Taylor, Toles, Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to create and maintain a Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Registry in which a person may voluntarily enroll for the purpose of being prohibited from obtaining a firearm; prohibiting a dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a firearm to a purchaser, lessee, borrower, or transferee who the dealer or other person knows or has reason to believe is registered on the registry; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0159
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-36)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Firearms - Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Registry - Establishment
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Favorable with Amendments {333621/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Firearms - Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Registry - Establishment
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Third Reading Passed (96-36) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-134,   5-207,   5-901 through 5-906 )
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 7:09 PM
Click to return on the top page