Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the On-Farm Organic Diversion and Composting Grant Program to award grants to eligible entities to assist with the costs of developing and implementing on-farm composting and compost use, food waste prevention, and food rescue projects; requiring the Department of the Environment to use funds from the Reduce, Recycle, Remanufacture Fund to support the Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste; authorizing the Department to establish a statewide solid waste disposal surcharge; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0056
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2023
Legislative Date
10/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2024
Legislative Date
1/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2023 10/26/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2024 1/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-2301, 2-2302 )
(   9-1701,   9-17A-01 through 9-17A-07, 9-201   )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page