Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Maryland Constitutional Carry Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that an individual may not be denied the right to purchase, own, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the individual is authorized under certain provisions of law to use medical cannabis.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0482 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Maryland Constitutional Carry Act)
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/17/2023 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page