Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to require absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters as defined in the federal Uniformed and Overseas Citizens Absentee Voting Act and voters with a disability who do not have a Maryland driver's license or Maryland identification card and who use an online absentee ballot application or another Internet method to request an absentee ballot to provide the last four digits of the applicant's Social Security number, rather than the full Social Security number.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
(   9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page