Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge (Safe Sleep Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Rosenberg, Taveras, and White Holland
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital, as soon as practicable before discharging an infant after the birth of the infant, to provide oral and written resources to the parent or legal guardian; requiring a hospital, before discharging an infant, to ask the parent or legal guardian to describe the sleep environment that will be provided at home; requiring, by January 1, 2025, each hospital to establish a process for providing resources and information about safe sleep environments to parents and legal guardians of infants; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0989 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/17/2023
Legislative Date
10/17/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333222/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {763524/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (36-100)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge (Safe Sleep Act of 2024)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-8)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/17/2023 10/17/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {333222/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {763524/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (36-100) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge (Safe Sleep Act of 2024)
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (124-8) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
(   19-308.10 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page