Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the period of time within which a person is required to file a Maryland estate tax return for the purpose of allowing a surviving spouse to take into account the deceased spousal unused exclusion amount to be consistent with the time for making a federal election; and applying the Act retroactively to any decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2023
Legislative Date
1/18/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2023
Legislative Date
2/23/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2023 1/18/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Favorable with Amendments {683021/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
House 2/23/2023 2/23/2023 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/17/2023 9:54 AM
Click to return on the top page