Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Sexting
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain mitigating factor in a certain juvenile court proceeding against a child for a certain violation if the violation involved or arose out of sexting; prohibiting the court from making a disposition of community detention if the violation arose out of sexting unless the court finds that extraordinary circumstances exist; authorizing the court to order a child whose violation arose out of sexting to participate in an age-appropriate educational program on the risks and consequences of sexting; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0272 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2020
Legislative Date
10/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles - Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {612915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juveniles - Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-8)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juveniles - Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2020 10/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Juveniles - Sexting
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {612915/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juveniles - Sexting
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-8) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Text - Chapter - Juveniles - Sexting
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page