Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending from September 30, 2022, to June 30, 2030, the termination date of the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and other provisions of law related to the Compact; and requiring the State Board of Physicians to include an update on the status of the Compact in its 2023 annual report.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 46-0
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723127/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed 46-0 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page