Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to increase the number of members, require that certain members have a background in certain activities, and require that certain members attended certain institutions of higher education; altering the membership of the Board of Regents of Morgan State University and the Board of Trustees of St. Mary's College of Maryland to increase the number of members and require that certain members have backgrounds in certain activities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/26/2020
Legislative Date
9/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/26/2020 9/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page