Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Acevero, Allen, Attar, Feldmark, Guyton, McCaskill, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Pruski, Ruth, and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Education from issuing a certificate of approval to noncollegiate educational institutions that do not have a policy prohibiting the administration of corporal punishment; requiring regulations adopted by the State Board for the registration of family child care homes and large family child care homes and the licensing and operation of child care centers to prohibit corporal punishment; and requiring the State Board to identify certain methods in a certain overall plan.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2023
Legislative Date
1/18/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2023
Legislative Date
1/18/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2023
Legislative Date
2/23/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2023 1/18/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/18/2023 1/18/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition
House 2/23/2023 2/23/2023 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2023 3/09/2023 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2023 3/09/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2023 3/09/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 10:31 AM
Click to return on the top page