Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a register of wills is not required to record or provide certain documents until the appropriate fee for the documents has been paid; altering certain probate fees on estates that are valued at a certain amount; requiring a register of wills to collect and assess certain fees at a certain time; authorizing registers of wills to provide certain services and charge certain fees for those services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0766 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-37)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {153125/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-37) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page