Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty and Qi
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term "failing on-site sewage disposal system" for certain provisions of law to mean an on-site sewage disposal system or a cesspool, or a component of an on-site sewage disposal system or a cesspool, that is a threat to the public health due to certain conditions; providing that the Act may not be construed to preempt or prevail over any county ordinance, law, or rule that provides a more stringent definition of the term "failing on-site sewage disposal system"; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {950911/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-5)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {950911/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-5) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {324035/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text - Chapter - Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
(   9-101 )
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page