Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Payments of Fines, Penalties, and Other Amounts - Addition Modification
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Bagnall, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Grossman, D. Jones, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Ruth, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an addition modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of certain trade or business expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year that are deducted under the Internal Revenue Code for the payment of certain fines, penalties, or other amounts; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Payments of Fines, Penalties, and Other Amounts - Addition Modification
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Payments of Fines, Penalties, and Other Amounts - Addition Modification
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 3:24 PM
Click to return on the top page