Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty and Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on the risks of sexting as part of the Family Life and Human Sexuality curriculum in every grade in which the curriculum is taught in public schools in the county, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {523221/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (39-95)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-4)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623623/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {523221/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (39-95) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-4) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 3/24/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page