Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to provide a copy of the school's library catalog to the county board of education on or before August 1 each year; requiring the county board to compile certain information on the public school's library catalogs and post the information on the county board's website; and requiring each public school to send the parents or guardians of students who attend the school a link to where certain information on the school's library catalog can be found on or before September 15 each year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-106.1 )
Last Updated: 1/30/2022 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page