Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - School Buses - Seat Belts
Sponsored by
Delegates Taveras, Guyton, Hill, and Kaufman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the public school safety education program to include student instruction concerning school bus safety and the proper use of seat belts on school buses; requiring that school buses purchased after July 1, 2027, be equipped with 3-point seat belts that are accessible to passengers for every seat on the school bus; and prohibiting a civil action for damages based on a failure of the school bus operator to ensure that an occupant of a school bus was wearing a seat belt.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0724
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2023
Legislative Date
10/31/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - School Buses - Seat Belts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - School Buses - Seat Belts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-31)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2023 10/31/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - School Buses - Seat Belts
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Favorable with Amendments {943127/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - School Buses - Seat Belts
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (110-31) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page