Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to issue a temporary license to practice physical therapy and limited physical therapy to certain applicants who meet certain requirements; providing that a temporary license authorizes certain individuals to practice limited physical therapy or physical therapy under direct supervision and is valid until a certain event occurs; altering the grounds on which the Board may take certain disciplinary action; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0517
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page