Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Charles, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the number of years before the end of the term of a video lottery operation license that a licensee is required to provide certain notice of intent to renew the license and is authorized to apply for renewal; providing for a 15-year term for a renewed license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission finds the licensee is no longer qualified; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0403 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {503620/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 3:24 PM
Click to return on the top page