Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the types of health care practitioners with whom a dental hygienist must consult before providing certain treatment to a dental patient to include a patient's registered nurse practitioner, certified nurse midwife, or licensed certified midwife; and requiring that a dental hygienist consult with the supervising dentist and the treating physician, registered nurse practitioner, certified nurse midwife, or licensed certified midwife if there is a change in a patient's medical condition.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0306
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 46-0
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703029/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed 46-0 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Text - Chapter - Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page