Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore City to recover the costs of implementing and administering a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, a school bus monitoring camera, or a vehicle height monitoring system; requiring Baltimore City, after recovering costs, to spend the remaining balance of fines collected from the monitoring systems solely on public safety or transportation infrastructure improvements consistent with the purpose and goals of the Complete Streets Program and the Complete Streets Transportation System; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0107 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page